TX HB628 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contracts by governmental entities and related professional services and to public works performance and payment bonds.
Title
Relating to contracts by governmental entities and related professional services and to public works performance and payment bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-27 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-20 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-11 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-10 | Postponed | |
2011-05-10 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2011-05-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-11 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-03-03 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-03 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | |
2011-02-21 | Read first time | |
2011-01-12 | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
City Government
City Government--General
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--General
DESIGN-BUILD CONTRACTS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--School Districts
Highways
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
City Government
City Government--General
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--General
DESIGN-BUILD CONTRACTS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--School Districts
Highways
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF