TX HB621 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibited adverse employment action against an employee who in good faith reports child abuse or neglect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibited adverse employment action against an employee who in good faith reports child abuse or neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#480 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-25 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-15HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-04-30SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#480
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback