TX HB619 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to developing a strategic plan to support the child-care workforce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to developing a strategic plan to support the child-care workforce.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1586 (Y: 95 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#330 (Y: 91 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1586
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-20SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20HouseRecord vote RV#330
2021-04-20HousePassed
2021-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-19HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB619
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00619I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00619H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00619E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00619S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00619F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00619I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00619H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00619H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00619E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00619E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00619S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00619S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00619F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB619&RcdVtNo=330&Ch=H&Dt=04/20/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB619&RcdVtNo=1586&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback