TX HB610 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures for presenting certain evidence at placement review hearings in suits affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to procedures for presenting certain evidence at placement review hearings in suits affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EVIDENCE
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB610 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00610I.htm |