TX HB6 | 2023 | 88th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-26 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-26 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to making an appropriation for the construction, operation, and maintenance of border barrier infrastructure.
Title
Relating to making an appropriation for the construction, operation, and maintenance of border barrier infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#59 (Y: 84 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#24 (Y: 84 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#23 (Y: 62 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-10-25 - House - 3-Hinojosa RV#22 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) RV#21 (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#24 (Y: 84 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#23 (Y: 62 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-10-25 - House - 3-Hinojosa RV#22 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) RV#21 (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-10-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-10-26 | House | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution |
2023-10-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-10-26 | House | Record vote RV#59 |
2023-10-26 | House | Passed |
2023-10-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-10-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-10-25 | House | Record vote RV#24 |
2023-10-25 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-10-25 | House | Amendment withdrawn 6-Thierry |
2023-10-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-10-25 | House | Record vote RV#23 |
2023-10-25 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 5-J. González |
2023-10-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-10-25 | House | Record vote RV#22 |
2023-10-25 | House | Amended 4-Martinez Fischer |
2023-10-25 | House | Amendment withdrawn 3-Hinojosa |
2023-10-25 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Article III, Section 40 |
2023-10-25 | House | Amendment(s) offered 3-Hinojosa |
2023-10-25 | House | Amendment withdrawn 2-Martinez Fischer |
2023-10-25 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Article III, Section 40 |
2023-10-25 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-Martinez Fischer |
2023-10-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-10-25 | House | Record vote RV#21 |
2023-10-25 | House | Amended 1-Jetton |
2023-10-25 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) |
2023-10-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-10-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-10-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-10-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-10-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-10-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-10-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-10-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-10-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-10-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-10-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-10-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-10-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aliens
BORDER
Governor
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
BORDER
Governor
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control