TX HB6 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 70-0)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to abortion complication reporting and the regulation of drug-induced abortion procedures, providers, and facilities; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to abortion complication reporting and the regulation of drug-induced abortion procedures, providers, and facilities; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors

Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-23HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-08-23HouseRead first time
2021-08-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB4 (Same As) 2021-09-17 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback