TX HB595 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to making certain false alarms or reports because of bias or prejudice; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to making certain false alarms or reports because of bias or prejudice; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB187 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB595 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00595I.htm |