TX HB584 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a program to facilitate, through the issuance and use of electronic toll collection transponders, free or discounted toll project use available to certain military personnel.
Title
Relating to a program to facilitate, through the issuance and use of electronic toll collection transponders, free or discounted toll project use available to certain military personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB584 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00584I.htm |