TX HB582 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption of tuition and laboratory fees at public institutions of higher education for certain paramedics.
Title
Relating to the exemption of tuition and laboratory fees at public institutions of higher education for certain paramedics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#456 (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#456 |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS