TX HB574 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of criminal offenses involving elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of criminal offenses involving elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1238 (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#305 (Y: 95 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Amended RV#287 (Y: 87 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-03 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-18HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-18SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-18HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1238
2021-05-18HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-13HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-13HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-12HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenatePassed
2021-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-12SenateAmended
2021-05-12SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa
2021-05-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-12SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-07SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-21SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#305
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#287
2021-04-15HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-15HouseAmended 1-J. González
2021-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1514 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to State Affairs
SB1514 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB574
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00574I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00574H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00574E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00574S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00574F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00574H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00574S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00574I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00574H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00574H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00574E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00574E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00574S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00574S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00574F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB574&RcdVtNo=287&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB574&RcdVtNo=305&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-12-F.PDF#page=22
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-12-F.PDF#page=23
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB574&RcdVtNo=1238&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021

Bill Comments

feedback