TX HB572 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the disposal of pesticides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the disposal of pesticides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#547 (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-28HouseRecord vote
2017-04-28HousePassed
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-20HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2016-12-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback