TX HB570 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Summary
Relating to requiring the disclosure of certain information to purchasers and renters of residential property.
Title
Relating to requiring the disclosure of certain information to purchasers and renters of residential property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-27 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-24 | Amendment(s) considered in s/c | |
2009-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2009-03-24 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-09 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2009-01-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC NOTICE
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC NOTICE