TX HB568 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to education and training for peace officers on interacting with persons with Alzheimer's disease and other dementias.
Title
Relating to education and training for peace officers on interacting with persons with Alzheimer's disease and other dementias.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#199 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#199 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-16 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-14 | House | Record vote RV#199 |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed |
2023-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB443 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB443 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB443 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Aging
ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING