TX HB567 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of a citation or notice to appear for certain misdemeanors punishable by a fine only.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of a citation or notice to appear for certain misdemeanors punishable by a fine only.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2017-03-09HouseCorrection in referral
2017-02-20HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2016-12-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback