TX HB565 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to powers of private toll project entities.
Title
Relating to powers of private toll project entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - HB 565Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - HB 565Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - SUSPEND ALL NECESSARY RULES (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - HB 565Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - SUSPEND ALL NECESSARY RULES (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-27 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Highways
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS