TX HB563 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the purposes and designation of a transportation reinvestment zone.
Title
Relating to the purposes and designation of a transportation reinvestment zone.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Harper-Brown [R] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Rep. Joe Pickett [D] |
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-17 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-16 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-16 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed | |
2011-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-12 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-04-14 | Read first time | |
2011-04-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-03-31 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-30 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-10 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-10 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-02-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-02-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-02-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time | |
2011-01-10 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Highways
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
County Government--General
Highways
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous