TX HB563 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Summary
Relating to the evaluation of applications for certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to the evaluation of applications for certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-21 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2009-01-12 | Filed |