TX HB561 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of certain vehicles used for package delivery; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of certain vehicles used for package delivery; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#475 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective immediately
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-05-03SenateRead first time
2017-04-27SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-25HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-20HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2016-12-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback