TX HB560 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to a residence or former residence to retrieve personal property by persons who are parties to certain suits and decrees.
Title
Relating to access to a residence or former residence to retrieve personal property by persons who are parties to certain suits and decrees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB260 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
DIVORCE
Family
Family--Family Violence
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Family
Family--Family Violence
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB560 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00560I.htm |