TX HB552 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a prohibition on coverage for abortion under health benefit plans offered through a health benefit exchange.
Title
Relating to a prohibition on coverage for abortion under health benefit plans offered through a health benefit exchange.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-23 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time | |
2011-01-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB552 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB00552I.htm |