TX HB55 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the reporting of certain information regarding prekindergarten programs provided by or on behalf of school districts.
Title
Relating to requiring the reporting of certain information regarding prekindergarten programs provided by or on behalf of school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#404 (Y: 98 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#359 (Y: 112 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#359 (Y: 112 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#404 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#359 |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB818 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--PRIMARY & SECONDARY--CLASS SIZE
Education--School Districts
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--PRIMARY & SECONDARY--CLASS SIZE
Education--School Districts
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN