TX HB549 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain duties of the Commission on Jail Standards regarding visitation periods for county jail prisoners.
Title
Relating to certain duties of the Commission on Jail Standards regarding visitation periods for county jail prisoners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - HB 549Third Reading House (Y: 94 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Coleman (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Coleman (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-11 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2015-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-18 | House | Filed |