TX HB541 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain claims for benefits, compensation, or assistance by certain public safety employees and survivors of certain public safety employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain claims for benefits, compensation, or assistance by certain public safety employees and survivors of certain public safety employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#437 (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-04-27SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#437
2021-04-27HousePassed
2021-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-26HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-26HouseAmended 4-C. Turner
2021-04-26HouseAmended 3-Patterson
2021-04-26HouseAmended 2-Patterson
2021-04-26HouseAmended 1-Patterson
2021-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB541
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00541I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00541H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00541E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00541H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00541H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00541H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00541H24.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00541I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00541H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00541H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB541&RcdVtNo=437&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2021

Bill Comments

feedback