TX HB539 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the ability of certain dependents of members of the United States military to enroll full-time in courses provided through the state virtual school network.
Title
Relating to the ability of certain dependents of members of the United States military to enroll full-time in courses provided through the state virtual school network.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DISTANCE EDUCATION
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Military & Veterans
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Military & Veterans