TX HB533 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to ad valorem tax sales of personal property seized under a tax warrant.
Title
Relating to ad valorem tax sales of personal property seized under a tax warrant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#306 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#306 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-10 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#306 |
2021-04-16 | House | Passed |
2021-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1366 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection