TX HB530 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the applicability to election judges of a prohibition on the carrying of a handgun at a polling place.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the applicability to election judges of a prohibition on the carrying of a handgun at a polling place.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#345 (Y: 94 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Amended RV#321 (Y: 88 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-03SenateRead first time
2021-04-20SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20HouseRecord vote RV#345
2021-04-20HousePassed
2021-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19HouseRecord vote RV#321
2021-04-19HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-19HouseAmended 1-Tinderholt
2021-04-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback