TX HB525 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to delivery of certain statutory county court, district court, or appellate court orders.
Title
Relating to delivery of certain statutory county court, district court, or appellate court orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1176 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-06 | House | Amended 1-Vasut |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-17 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--General
Electronic Information Systems
Courts--Administration
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--General
Electronic Information Systems