TX HB523 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the requirement that certain elected school district boards make audio and video recordings of certain work sessions and special called meetings available on the Internet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the requirement that certain elected school district boards make audio and video recordings of certain work sessions and special called meetings available on the Internet.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1009 (Y: 137 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-08HouseRecord vote
2017-05-08HousePassed
2017-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-06HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-12-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback