TX HB52 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sale of a cemetery plot; providing penalties; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sale of a cemetery plot; providing penalties; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-30 - House - HB 52Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenatePassed
2013-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-15SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-05-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-05-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-02SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2013-05-02SenateRead first time
2013-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-30HouseRecord vote
2013-04-30HousePassed
2013-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-29HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2013-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-03-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-03-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-18HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2013-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-03-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-02-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-02-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-04HouseReferred to Investments & Financial Services
2013-02-04HouseRead first time
2012-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback