TX HB5158 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of service members and veterans to participate in a veterans treatment court program based on citizenship status.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of service members and veterans to participate in a veterans treatment court program based on citizenship status.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |