TX HB515 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to assessment of public school students and providing accelerated instruction and eliminating performance requirements based on performance on certain assessment instruments.
Title
Relating to assessment of public school students and providing accelerated instruction and eliminating performance requirements based on performance on certain assessment instruments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#807 (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#712 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amendment tabled RV#711 (Y: 86 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#710 (Y: 57 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#807 (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#712 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amendment tabled RV#711 (Y: 86 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#710 (Y: 57 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-26 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing