TX HB512 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to Health Care Reform, Select
Pending: House Health Care Reform, Select Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to Health Care Reform, Select
Pending: House Health Care Reform, Select Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the expansion of eligibility for Medicaid to certain persons under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
Relating to the expansion of eligibility for Medicaid to certain persons under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Health Care Reform, Select |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB39 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB71 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB39 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
HJR17 (Enabling for) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Health Care Reform, Select
SB71 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB39 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Health & Human Services
HJR17 (Enabling for) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Health Care Reform, Select
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB512 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00512I.htm |