TX HB511 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to removing the deadline for the Department of Family and Protective Services to enter into permanency care assistance agreements.
Title
Relating to removing the deadline for the Department of Family and Protective Services to enter into permanency care assistance agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#89 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-16 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed |
2017-03-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-03-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Emergency Calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-06 | House | Filed |