TX HB505 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a prohibition of limitations on the number of dual credit courses or hours in which a public high school student may enroll.
Title
Relating to a prohibition of limitations on the number of dual credit courses or hours in which a public high school student may enroll.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Paul Workman [R] | Rep. Wayne Smith [R] | Rep. Tony Dale [R] |
Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Byron Cook [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - HB 505Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | Effective immediately | |
2015-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-12 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-13 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-09 | House | Amended |
2015-04-09 | House | Amended |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-03-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS