TX HB500 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-9)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the effect of certain felony convictions of public elected officers.
Title
Relating to the effect of certain felony convictions of public elected officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-04 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-04 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-02 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on Emergency Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Ethics
Legislature
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
State Officers
Criminal Procedure--General
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Ethics
Legislature
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
State Officers