TX HB5 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to debris management and other disaster recovery efforts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to debris management and other disaster recovery efforts.

Sponsors

Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]
Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]
Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]
Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]
Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#276 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-11HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#276
2019-04-11HousePassed
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback