TX HB5 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-7)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-7)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Department of Family and Protective Services and the transfer of certain powers and duties from the Health and Human Services Commission.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Department of Family and Protective Services and the transfer of certain powers and duties from the Health and Human Services Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2020 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - FA8 Huffman (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Amended RV#57 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#51 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#50 (Y: 89 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#49 (Y: 92 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#48 (Y: 90 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#44 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2020 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - FA8 Huffman (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Amended RV#57 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#51 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#50 (Y: 89 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#49 (Y: 92 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#48 (Y: 90 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#44 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-01 | House | Amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-01 | House | Amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-02-27 | House | Calendars Committee rule adopted |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on Emergency Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-02-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-02-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES COUNCIL
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES COUNCIL
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions