TX HB4964 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sale, possession, or consumption of alcoholic beverages at the Texas State History Museum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sale, possession, or consumption of alcoholic beverages at the Texas State History Museum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-27 Effective immediately
2023-05-27 Signed by the Governor
2023-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-15HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-15HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-12HouseSenate passage reported
2023-05-12SenateRecord vote
2023-05-12SenatePassed
2023-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-12SenateRecord vote
2023-05-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2023-05-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2023-05-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-05-08SenateVote taken in committee
2023-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-01SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2023-05-01SenateRead first time
2023-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2023-05-01HouseReported engrossed
2023-04-28HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-28HouseRecord vote RV#681
2023-04-28HousePassed
2023-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2023-04-28HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-28HousePassed to engrossment
2023-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-28HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-04-25HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-04-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-14HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-23HouseReferred to State Affairs
2023-03-23HouseRead first time
2023-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2060 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - Left pending in committee
SB2060 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB4964
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04964I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04964H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04964E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04964S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04964F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04964I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB04964H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04964E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB4964&RcdVtNo=681&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2023
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-12-F1.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-12-F1.PDF#page=17

Bill Comments

feedback