TX HB493 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting requirements for the College Credit for Heroes program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting requirements for the College Credit for Heroes program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective on 1/1/18
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-01HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-26HouseMeeting cancelled
2017-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-25HousePosting rule suspended
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-12-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback