TX HB491 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring registration as a sex offender of certain defendants convicted of the offense of continuous trafficking of persons.
Title
Relating to requiring registration as a sex offender of certain defendants convicted of the offense of continuous trafficking of persons.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#267 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Read 2nd time RV#259 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Read 2nd time RV#259 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-18 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | House | Passed |
2017-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-17 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-05 | House | Filed |