TX HB490 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health benefit plan coverage of hearing aids and cochlear implants for certain individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health benefit plan coverage of hearing aids and cochlear implants for certain individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#385 (Y: 121 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-25HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25HouseRecord vote
2017-04-25HousePassed
2017-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-24HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-24HouseAmended
2017-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-12-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback