TX HB482 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limitation on the authority to arrest a person for certain misdemeanors punishable by fine only.
Title
Relating to a limitation on the authority to arrest a person for certain misdemeanors punishable by fine only.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2010 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
ARREST WARRANTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB482 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00482I.htm |