TX HB482 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to employee caseload limit goals for child and adult protective services and child-care licensing services and call processing goals for certain of those services.
Title
Relating to employee caseload limit goals for child and adult protective services and child-care licensing services and call processing goals for certain of those services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--General
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB482 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00482I.htm |