TX HB4811 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Texas Energy Efficiency Council.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Texas Energy Efficiency Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1002 (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#964 (Y: 89 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#964 (Y: 89 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#1002 |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed |
2023-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#964 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment withdrawn 2-Tinderholt |
2023-05-03 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-Tinderholt |
2023-05-03 | House | Amended 1-AnchĂa |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-17 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2404 (Same As) 2023-04-13 - Co-author authorized
SB2404 (Same As) 2023-04-13 - Co-author authorized
SB2404 (Same As) 2023-04-13 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Energy
ENERGY EFFICIENCY COUNCIL, TEXAS
Energy--Conservation
Energy--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXPERIMENT STATION
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Energy
ENERGY EFFICIENCY COUNCIL, TEXAS
Energy--Conservation
Energy--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXPERIMENT STATION
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS