TX HB48 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the Department of Public Safety to operate one or more southbound vehicle checkpoints near the international border of this state for the purpose of preventing certain criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to authorizing the Department of Public Safety to operate one or more southbound vehicle checkpoints near the international border of this state for the purpose of preventing certain criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Pena [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |