TX HB478 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to civil liability for removing certain individuals from a motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to civil liability for removing certain individuals from a motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1790 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1023 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Amendment as amended fails of adoption RV#1022 (Y: 85 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) RV#990 (Y: 79 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseRecord vote
2017-05-08HousePassed
2017-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseRecord vote
2017-05-08HouseAmendment as amended fails of adoption
2017-05-08HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-08HouseVote reconsidered
2017-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-08HousePostponed
2017-05-08HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-08HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-08HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-08HousePostponed
2017-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-06HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-06HousePostponed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HouseAmended
2017-05-06HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-12-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB478
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00478I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00478H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00478E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00478S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00478F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB478&RcdVtNo=990&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB478&RcdVtNo=1022&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB478&RcdVtNo=1023&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB478&RcdVtNo=1790&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=25

Bill Comments

feedback