TX HB472 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to judicial review of protective orders and the duration of those orders.
Title
Relating to judicial review of protective orders and the duration of those orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dale [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. Jason Isaac [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-10 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
PROTECTIVE ORDERS