TX HB467 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the limitations period for certain criminal offenses based on assaultive conduct.
Title
Relating to the limitations period for certain criminal offenses based on assaultive conduct.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Craddick [R] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. Ann Johnson [D] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] |
Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#390 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#390 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-08 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-21 | House | Record vote RV#390 |
2023-04-21 | House | Passed |
2023-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-23 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1570 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB1570 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB1570 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Criminal Justice