TX HB4661 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the rate of the municipal hotel occupancy tax in certain municipalities and to the use of certain revenue from the tax.
Title
Relating to the rate of the municipal hotel occupancy tax in certain municipalities and to the use of certain revenue from the tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Brown [R] | Sen. Steve Ogden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |