TX HB464 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring candidates to pay a filing fee or submit a petition in lieu of a filing fee to appear on the ballot for the general election for state and county officers.
Title
Relating to requiring candidates to pay a filing fee or submit a petition in lieu of a filing fee to appear on the ballot for the general election for state and county officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Elections |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Candidates
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
SECRETARY OF STATE
Elections--Administration
Elections--Candidates
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
SECRETARY OF STATE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB464 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00464I.htm |